ST DENNIS AND NANPEAN COMMUNITY CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Give grants to projects within the Cornwall Council Ward of St Dennis and Nanpean only
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £145,158 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 21 October 2015: CIO registration
- ST DENNIS AND NANPEAN COMMUNITY CHARITABLE INCORPERATED ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Jayne Hutton | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Hutton | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Floyd | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael Cole | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Burnett | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike McLening | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Truscott | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|||||
JULIA CLARKE | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Ann Chapman | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Tanya Marie Edmunds | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.31k | £116.90k | £127.96k | £133.97k | £145.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.83k | £194.18k | £182.25k | £215.23k | £140.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £137.31k | £116.90k | £127.96k | £133.97k | £145.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Oct 2015 as amended on 06 Jun 2019 as amended on 04 Dec 2020 as amended on 17 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
(1)To promote the preservation of health of people living in the Area of Benefit; (2)To assist in the provision of recreational facilities for the people living in the Area of Benefit in the interests of social welfare who by reason of their youth, age, infirmity, disablement, financial or social or economic circumstances, have need of such facilities with the object of improving their condition of life; (3)To promote the protection and improvement of the environment in the Area of Benefit; (4)To promote sustainable development; sustainable development means ?development which meets the needs of the present without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs. (5)To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees see fit from time to time. Nothing in this constitution shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not exclusively charitable purposes for the public benefit.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Claytawc Training & Work Centre
Fore Street
St. Dennis
ST. AUSTELL
Cornwall
PL26 8AF
- Phone:
- 07900117241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window