BOROUGH OF REDCAR AND CLEVELAND'S EMERGENCY RELIEF FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the purpose of relieving either individually or generally persons resident in the area of benefit who are in conditions of need, hardship, or distress by making grants of money or in making loans free of interest or providing or paying for services or facilities calculated to the need, hardship or distress of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 12 January 1977: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- BOROUGH OF REDCAR AND CLEVELAND'S EMERGENCY RELIEF FUND (Working name)
- THE MAYOR OF LANGBAURGH'S EMERGENCY RELIEF FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £328 | £328 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 03 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 18 February 2011 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 MAY 1976 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1997 MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2)(D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR IN MAKING LOANS FREE OF INTEREST OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF LANGBAURGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window