THE INSTITUTE FOR AVIATION RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education, for the benefit of the public, by promotion, on a non-political basis, of research into aviation policy and air transport ecosystems and to improve public understanding of aviation related issues through independent and rigorous research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
- Hong Kong
Governance
- 11 May 2015: CIO registration
- IAR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ZHENG LEI | Chair | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr John F O'Connell | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHEUNG KWOK LAW | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
WEI HUA JIANG FCCA | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.04k | £0 | £0 | £96 | £249 | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.96k | £10.41k | £8.38k | £317 | £21.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 May 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY PROMOTION, ON A NON-POLITICAL BASIS, OF RESEARCH INTO AVIATION POLICY AND AIR TRANSPORT MANAGEMENT AND TO IMPROVE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF AVIATION RELATED ISSUES, IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD THROUGH INDEPENDENT AND RIGOROUS RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roxhill Manor Farm
Roxhill Road
Marston Moretaine
BEDFORD
MK43 0QG
- Phone:
- +61421483288
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window