Financial history TOBIAS HITMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1164588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £25.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k
Total expenditure £41.61k £19.63k £19.34k £16.35k £19.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A