TOBIAS HITMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial support to deprived Jewish children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 26 November 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Samuel Joseph Atkins | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Kosky | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marianne Izen | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.61k | £19.63k | £19.34k | £16.35k | £19.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/11/2015 as amended on 17 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO DEPRIVED CHILDREN UP THE AGE OF 13 ATTENDING JEWISH SCHOOLS, WHO ARE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ISRAEL, TO ENABLE THEM TO OBTAIN SUCH AN EDUCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS ARE CHARITABLE, ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 GLENMORE LAWNS
ARGYLE ROAD
LONDON
W13 0NA
- Phone:
- 02089987188
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window