Accounts and annual returns KINGDOM B. E.
Charity number: 1161542

Charity reporting is up to date (153 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2025 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2023 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 January 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2021 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
06 March 2021 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window