ASSEMBLY OF THE LIVING YAHWEH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote Yahweh's Bible doctrine and values. Train and educate members in accordance with Yahshua's love, so as to achieve biblical spiritual development, worship and praise Yahweh. Reaching out to the sick, bereaved, depressed, jobless; supporting helpless members e.g assisting elderly, drug and alcoholic addicts. Baptise members, conduct wedding, conduct child dedication services, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 12 March 2015: CIO registration
- THE LIVING CHURCH OF GOD(FAITH MINISTRIES) (Working name)
- THE LIVING CHURCH OF GOD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karleen Chichura-Nabintu | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
FELICIA ADZA | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
GODWIN ARIKIBE | Trustee | 25 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.61k | £14.18k | £11.13k | £9.25k | £8.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.85k | £7.85k | £9.32k | £10.07k | £16.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 27 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 23
Northwood Court
Ringland Close
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 2NZ
- Phone:
- 01782417035
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window