THE HIVE FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A food bank: the relief of poverty, financial hardship or distress in London by providing emergency food relief to individuals and families experiencing crisis situations, whether long or short-term.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £13,260 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Islington
Governance
- 24 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eppie Leese | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev TAMSIN MERCHANT | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hill | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRYONY JANE HIRSCH | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE AMY STEWART | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.23k | £56.04k | £43.76k | £30.89k | £65.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.07k | £20.30k | £42.89k | £44.55k | £54.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.36k | £2.40k | £15.64k | £8.55k | £13.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Jun 2015 as amended on 19 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN LONDON BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONG PEOPLE IN NEED LIVING OR WORKING IN LONDON BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FOOD WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Halstow Road
LONDON
NW10 5DB
- Phone:
- 07753500624
- Email:
- hivefoodbank@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window