Financial history 1ST WHITEHAVEN ST NICHOLAS GUIDES

Charity number: 505900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.07k £920 £195 £946 £3.48k
Total expenditure £1.44k £1.06k £28 £868 £1.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A