Financial history CASE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1166966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.43m £429.95k £4.79m £550.90k £577.01k
Total expenditure £342.08k £286.58k £375.04k £496.25k £590.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £43.15k £18.59k £5.36k £21.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £6.13m N/A £4.28m £6.43k £21.79k
Income - Other trading activities £5.83k N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £58.60k £75.02k £93.95k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £283.83k N/A £444.01k £469.45k £461.27k
Income - Other £3.49k N/A £8.46k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £295.59k N/A £309.83k £409.69k £491.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.48k N/A £65.21k £86.57k £99.04k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £38.70k £55.69k £146.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £65.21k £86.57k £99.04k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0