UNIVERSITY OF GEORGIA FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
University of Georgia Foundation UK was formed with the intent of providing support to the University of Georgia's study abroad program at Oxford University.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY STOREY | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 May 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 May 2022 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 May 2022 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 May 2022 | 391 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF GEORGIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Press Place
Suite 101
Athens
GA
30601
- Phone:
- 7065426677
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window