Financial history STRIDE FOUNDATION UK

Charity Number: 1161442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £90 £0 £0 £438.48k £38.59k
Total expenditure £922 £1.35k £452 £12.59k £25.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A