BRS EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle objective of BRS Education Limited is to provide education and training of the highest possible standard for those employed in the racing industry or seeking employment in the racing industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£4,484,105
Donations and legacies | £536.34k | |
Charitable activities | £3.46m | |
Other trading activities | £144.60k | |
Investments | £52.50k | |
Other | £294.40k |
Total expenditure:
£5,076,498
Raising funds | £43.92k | |
Charitable activities | £4.91m | |
Other | £118.11k |
-£111,097 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,172,607 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £162.03k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.91m |
People

65 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 September 1980: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH RACING SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Alice Grimwade | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Harry Derham | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Passam | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Drabwell | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bishop | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Small | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward George Creasy | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Budd | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justin John Wyndham Wadham | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYDIA HISLOP | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.56m | £3.46m | £3.48m | £4.44m | £4.48m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08m | £3.86m | £4.03m | £4.67m | £5.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.13m | £1.15m | £1.05m | £1.26m | £1.17m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £57.55k | £14.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £212.83k | £421.40k | £335.54k | £565.40k | £536.34k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £315.78k | £158.56k | £75.37k | £99.96k | £144.60k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.79m | £2.67m | £2.81m | £3.46m | £3.46m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £53.10k | £45.84k | £40.47k | £39.94k | £52.50k | |
|
Income - Other | £185.53k | £159.99k | £215.48k | £270.37k | £294.40k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.76m | £3.60m | £3.87m | £4.52m | £4.91m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £307.80k | £255.43k | £137.06k | £122.82k | £43.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.41k | £24.06k | £25.60k | £24.27k | £39.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £15.01k | £16.52k | £16.02k | £16.21k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £7.55k | £3.89k | £24.27k | £22.14k | £118.11k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.84m | £3.47m | £3.14m | £2.98m | £2.80m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.48m | £2.38m | £2.71m | £2.38m | £2.15m | |
|
Other assets | £845.68k | £643.51k | £651.58k | £816.98k | £796.89k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £619.91k | £407.99k | £633.04k | £675.51k | £943.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/04/2015 as amended on 11 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
The advancement of education (both academic and vocational) for the public benefit of those who are primarily but not exclusively involved in the horseracing and bloodstock industry by: 1. Providing education and training of the highest possible standard for those employed in or seeking employment in the horse racing industry. 2. Providing initiatives involving horses and/or ponies, whether autonomously or in association with community groups, charities and/or schools, with a view to promoting community cohesion and mental health and so as to support, in particular, those experiencing poor physical or mental health, social isolation and/or anti-social behaviour. 3. Using interaction with horse and ponies as a mechanism to deliver specific projects, particularly but not exclusively, for children and young people designed to build self-confidence, improve communication skills, increase aspiration and enhance employment potential.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 11 September 1980 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BRITISH RACING SCHOOL
Snailwell Road
NEWMARKET
CB8 7NU
- Phone:
- 01638665103
- Email:
- enquiries@brs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window