HAZLEMERE MEMORIAL HALL CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance of the Memorial Hall and donations to not for profit organisations based within the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 29 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip John Oldcorn | Chair | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Horton | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Roy | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Russ Murden | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Baker | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.14k | £44.34k | £47.91k | £56.03k | £60.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.97k | £41.46k | £49.43k | £46.17k | £64.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Apr 2015 as amended on 10 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAZLEMERE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS; AND 2) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FUNDING TO ORGANISATIONS AND FOR PROJECTS WHICH MAKE AN APPLICATION TO THE CIO AND WHICH WILL APPLY THE FUNDS FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN A WAY THAT BENEFITS THE COMMUNITY OF HAZLEMERE AND IMPROVES THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR ITS INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hazlemere Memorial Hall
Amersham Road
Hazlemere
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP15 7QW
- Phone:
- 01494452074
- Email:
- trustees@hazlemerehall.org
- Website:
-
hazlemerehall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window