Accounts and annual returns JESUS FELLOWSHIP LIFE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1163665
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On Time