SACRED GIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity gives grants to other charities to achieve its objects. The main project is in Burkina Faso where the charity has given grants to a local charity . The charity has also started giving grants to a Turkish based charity running an orphanage for Syrian children . who are victims of ongoing political unrest and civil war inside Syria. UK public donations is the main source of income.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
- Burkina Faso
- Turkey
Governance
- 04 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Elizabeth Altawil | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad aziz Khan | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Nawaz | Trustee | 21 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Moddasser Malik | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
HASHIM AHMED MOHAMMED AL-AIDROOS | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Kamran Shah | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Kabeer | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.81k | £222.11k | £125.73k | £239.29k | £100.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.84k | £176.61k | £78.89k | £256.94k | £135.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (B) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ORPHANS AND WIDOWS; (C) TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PEOPLE WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR ARMED CONFLICT OR NATURAL AND/OR MAN-MADE DISASTERS, EPIDEMIC, OR FAMINE, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) PROVISION OF EMERGENCY RESPONSE AND RECOVERY INCLUDING THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AND/OR FINANCIAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS; AND (D) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF REFUGEES AND DISPLACED PERSONS, INCLUDING BY PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, IN ALL CASES BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS, WORKING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD REGARDLESS OF THE BENEFICIARIES' RELIGION, RACE, ETHNICITY, GENDER, GEOGRAPHICAL LOCATION AND POLITICAL CONVICTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Ferndown Green
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD5 9QT
- Phone:
- 01924476644
- Email:
- info@sacredgivinguk.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window