Financial history NATIONAL SEARCH AND RESCUE DOG ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1161859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.62k £12.34k £26.04k £23.67k £23.67k
Total expenditure £24.57k £4.72k £13.47k £22.13k £22.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A