Financial history YOU AND ME PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1161960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £91.30k £71.65k £79.36k £102.09k £109.00k
Total expenditure £81.72k £67.72k £74.21k £86.36k £104.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £64.41k £79.22k £87.16k
Income from government grants £74.62k £13.04k £899 N/A N/A