Financial history FLORAL ANGELS

Charity number: 1162746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.42k £3.71k £1.48k £2.12k £1.23k
Total expenditure £7.04k £1.43k £4.85k £5.76k £6.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A