HOME-START YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Safeguarding, protecting and preserving the good health, both mental and physical, of children and parents of children b) Preventing cruelty to or maltreatment of children c) Relieving sickness, poverty and need amongst children and parents of children d) Promoting the education of the public in better standards of childcare within the area of York and its environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £32,946 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
64 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
Governance
- 01 April 2015: Standard registration
- 29 September 2016: Funds received from 700797 HOME-START YORK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Furby | Chair | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Keel | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jess Harrison | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Lynn Beardsley | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Louise Blower | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Anne Heptonstall | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Margaret Murphy | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.10k | £176.45k | £120.68k | £146.10k | £78.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.55k | £133.20k | £123.53k | £110.57k | £134.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £81.02k | £71.36k | £35.20k | £58.15k | £32.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
A. TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B. TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF YORK AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Gatehouse
49 Cemetery Road
YORK
YO10 5AJ
- Phone:
- 07519 976946
- Email:
- support@homestartyork.org
- Website:
-
homestartyork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window