Financial history BILAL EDUCATIONAL FORUM

Charity number: 1162397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £131.26k £105.13k £161.37k £199.57k £209.86k
Total expenditure £225.32k £271.25k £137.84k £136.93k £99.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.46k N/A N/A N/A