REALISE ACADEMY PARTNERSHIP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trust supports member academies to achieve their individual goals by: ? Developing and sharing best practice in teaching, learning and curriculum ? Creating a skilled, motivated, expert workforce through coordination of professional training, coaching, career development and recruitment. ? Working collaboratively to increase operational efficiency and make optimum use of available resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 August 2015: Standard registration
- 25 April 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RAPT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.95k | £2.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 24 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/08/2015
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: 3.1.1 PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR SUCH PURPOSES INCLUDING BY PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING MODELS OF GOOD PRACTICE AND BY THE DELIVERY OF SUPPORT SERVICES GENERALLY TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS; AND 3.1.2 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WHO WORK OR VOLUNTEER IN, OR GOVERN, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS TO DELIVER A HIGH QUALITY EDUCATION TO THE PUPILS AND COMMUNITIES SERVED BY THOSE INSTITUTIONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window