NEW CREATION LIVING MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP SERVICES IN THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Merton
Governance
- 21 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Junior Mensah - Bonsu | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK RANDOLPH | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR OLIVER GARSHONG | Trustee | 21 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.17k | £14.53k | £10.79k | £15.95k | £27.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.27k | £6.57k | £2.68k | £12.48k | £27.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Wheatstone Close
Mitcham
CR4 3RN
- Phone:
- 07888960571
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window