Accounts and annual returns YOUNG EXPLORERS FOUNDATION (NEW FOREST)

Charity number: 1161968
Charity reporting is overdue by 1500 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
Annual return 03 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 404 days
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 404 days
Annual return 03 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 770 days
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 770 days
Annual return 03 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1135 days
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1135 days
Annual return 03 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1500 days
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1500 days