YOUNG EXPLORERS FOUNDATION (NEW FOREST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide search and rescue on sea and land to teach teenage Cadets Seamanship and Navigation First Aid and are of self survival and Wild Camping . Overseas Expeditons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 June 2018
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 03 June 2015: CIO registration
- YOUNG EXPLORERS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COMMODORE PHILIP GORDON PEARCE-SMITH MBE | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/06/2016 | 03/06/2017 | 03/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.19k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.76k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days | |
Annual return | 03 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days | |
Annual return | 03 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 778 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 778 days | |
Annual return | 03 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1143 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1143 days | |
Annual return | 03 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1508 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1508 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY BY SUPPLEMENTING AND SUPPORTING EMERGENCY SERVICES, STATUTORY BODIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HELPING RESCUE MOTORISTS STRANDED IN ADVERSE WEATHER CONDITIONS IN THE HAMPSHIRE AREA. (2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARBOUR LIGHTS
75 LONG LANE
HOLBURY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 2ND
- Phone:
- 02380891280
- Email:
- captiffy13@msn.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window