Financial history CANDLE OF HOPE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1161832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £9.21k £19.96k £18.52k £25.83k £32.94k
Total expenditure £7.61k £24.90k £18.39k £18.29k £30.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A