Accounts and annual returns KENYA COMMUNITY EDUCATION PROJECT

Charity number: 1163597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 10 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 August 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 August 2021 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window