Financial history KENYA COMMUNITY EDUCATION PROJECT

Charity number: 1163597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.88k £4.30k £2.17k £2.00k £3.64k
Total expenditure £4.88k £3.63k £3.13k £1.85k £3.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A