FOUNDATION FOR FREE RADIO PEACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Peace and Harmony by production of Radio Programmes Recording and production of radio programmes to bring hope and comfort to refugees of the Syrian Crisis. Production of Educational radio programmes for the children of refugees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Cyprus
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 22 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ALEXANDER RUSLING | Chair | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN RUSLING | Trustee | 15 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARRY HOWARD ROBINSON | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE RUSLING | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.29k | £2.80k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.50k | £2.40k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 December 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE LEVANT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRODUCTION AND DISSEMINATION OF RADIO PROGRAMMES OF AN EVANGELISTIC OR TEACHING NATURE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE LEVANT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PRODUCTION AND DISSEMINATION OF EDUCATIONAL OR INSTRUCTIONAL RADIO PROGRAMMES. (C) TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY AND EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: I) PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT THE PEACEFUL ASPECTS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WITHIN THE OVERALL MESSAGES DURING PROGRAMMES PRODUCED IN PURSUANCE OF OBJECT (A). II) PROMOTING TOLERANCE AND HARMONY BY THE USE OF PEACEFUL LANGUAGE AND ATTITUDES WITHIN ALL PROGRAMMES, LEADING TO A MORE HARMONIOUS COEXISTENCE BETWEEN THE VARIOUS DIFFERENT COMMUNITIES WHO MIGHT HEAR THE PROGRAMMES. III) PROMOTING THE MESSAGE OF EQUAL RIGHTS AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL WITHIN THE PROGRAMMES, IN PARTICULAR THOSE PROGRAMMES OF AN EDUCATIONAL NATURE AS PROPOSED IN OBJECT (B) (D) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN MIDDLE EASTERN COUNTRIES WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR, NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE. (E) THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR IN MIDDLE EASTERN COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 PACKMAN LANE
KIRK ELLA
HULL
HU10 7TL
- Phone:
- 0844 2477279
- Email:
- TRUSTEES@FREERADIOPEACE.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window