THE RIPPLE POND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ripple Pond provides peer-led services for adults supporting loved ones who have been physically, or psychologically injured due to their service with The British Armed Forces. We serve all families regardless of services, both regular and reserve, commissioned and non-commissioned. Our peer-led services provide support groups, specialised 1-to-1 support and information and event services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £145,935 from 3 government contract(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Chile
- Cyprus
- Falkland Islands
- France
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
Governance
- 09 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier Andrew Charles Wood | Chair | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Parker | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Arnold | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Werrett | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Cook | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Begley | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mason | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ruth Watts | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mark Broomfield | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Cheesman | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.56k | £154.73k | £217.77k | £206.78k | £214.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.18k | £120.58k | £127.83k | £196.28k | £254.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £112.43k | £145.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 09 APR 2015 AMENDED ON 07 MAR 2016 as amended on 23 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are to relieve the need, suffering and distress of Beneficiaries, in particular by: • Enabling Beneficiaries to meet each other to provide reassurance and comfort to one another; • Providing an opportunity to Beneficiaries to share coping strategies; and • Encouraging self-motivation amongst Beneficiaries for recovery from secondary trauma. Beneficiaries must be at least 18 years of age. In this objects clause: 1. "Beneficiaries" shall mean: a) the families, partners, relatives and other dependants of members and former members of the British Armed Forces; and b) the families, partners, relatives and other dependants of members and former members of any Allied Forces Unit. 2. "Allied Forces Unit" shall mean any unit of any foreign military body allied to His Majesty's Armed Forces at the time of the Member's service
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground Floor
66 High Street
Lewes
East Sussex
BN7 1XG
- Phone:
- 03339001028
- Email:
- admin@theripplepond.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window