AL KHIDMAH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QUR'AAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH); (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND GENERAL PUBLIC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 21 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABID ALI ZEINULADIN RAMJAN | Chair | 26 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Mohamad Nasir Basid | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
NASIMULGANI DINGMAR | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
SAHAB QURESHI | Trustee | 26 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDULGAFUR MOHAMED MANGA | Trustee | 26 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MUNIR AHMED ABDUL CADIR | Trustee | 26 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED AZAM MONIA | Trustee | 26 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDULNAIM MOHAMED MANGA | Trustee | 26 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDULLA GULAM MAMODO | Trustee | 26 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELYAS KARA | Trustee | 26 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £352.85k | £339.73k | £67.44k | £44.87k | £156.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £293.75k | £501.88k | £73.26k | £101.89k | £140.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/02/2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QUR'AAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH); (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES, AND THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SAID PERSONS; (3) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, THE DISABLED, VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR FOOD, CLOTHING, BURIALS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (4) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE POOR, UNDERPRIVILEGED AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF CLINICS, EQUIPMENT, MEDICINES OR GRANTS FOR MEDICAL DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, OR PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al Khidmah Foundation
132-138 Charnwood Street
LEICESTER
LE5 3AE
- Phone:
- 07808495170
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window