Financial history PUBLIC HEALTH REGISTER

Charity number: 1162895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £376.72k £382.94k £340.10k £404.30k £466.76k
Total expenditure £324.41k £338.15k £418.24k £527.94k £498.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £25.05k N/A £95.19k
Income from government grants N/A £48.25k N/A N/A N/A