FRIENDS OF SOUTH PARK GARDENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance, improvement and enhancement of South Park Gardens, Wimbledon, London, SW19 as a recreational area to be used and enjoyed by the whole community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Merton
Governance
- 30 June 2015: CIO registration
- 18 January 2017: Funds received from 1097483 THE FRIENDS OF SOUTH PARK GARDENS
- FSPG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Evans | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Hay | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Susan Threadgold | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Day | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ROGERS LLB HONS | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA NAYIRI LUCAS | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.91k | £4.35k | £8.90k | £17.25k | £20.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.20k | £9.15k | £9.05k | £10.87k | £12.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE SUPPORT AND ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE AND ENHANCEMENT OF SOUTH PARK GARDENS LOCATED IN WIMBLEDON, LONDON SW19 (THE PARK) AS A RECREATIONAL AREA (IN THE CONTEXT OF IT BEING A LISTED GARDEN IN A CONSERVATION AREA) TO BE USED AND ENJOYED BY THE COMMUNITY OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON AND THE BROADER COMMUNITY OF LONDON AND OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES. 2) TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT INCLUDING:PROMOTING SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING IN THE A)CONTINUATION OF THE PARKS STATUS AS A GRADE II LISTED GARDEN; B) ENHANCEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE PARK BY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON. 3) TO IDENTIFY AND IMPLEMENT SECURITY MEASURES FOR THE PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 KINGS ROAD
LONDON
SW19 8QW
- Phone:
- 07973409579
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.