ORGANISATION FOR CARIBBEAN ARTS CULTURE AND HERITAGE

Charity number: 1162814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Arts related activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • OCACH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AUGUSTINE SANDY Trustee 01 July 2015
None on record
GISELLE CARTER-SANDY Trustee 01 July 2015
None on record
JUNIOR COURTNEY BROWN Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 January 2025 363 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 April 2023 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 April 2023 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 Taranto Road
CANVEY ISLAND
SS8 7LH
Phone:
07581485307
Email:
No information available