SOUNDCAFE LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SoundCafe (SCL) aims to inspire those who are homeless or socially isolated as a consequence of their living arrangements, by providing safe creative spaces. SCL offers opportunities for guests to access services that encourage their physical, emotional and spiritual well-being, enabling them to sing together as a choir, creative writing, arts, crafts and football health & well-being workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 04 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Anthony Robert Leighton | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Furniss | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew George Scott | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Barrett | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Gemma Parkes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Keith Fletcher | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Pete Miller | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SANDIE SOBIERAJ | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/03/2020 | 09/03/2021 | 09/03/2022 | 09/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.97k | £84.22k | £57.39k | £27.94k | £39.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.74k | £44.42k | £57.05k | £67.49k | £60.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £8.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
AS AN EXPRESSION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND VALUES, THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND THE OTHER CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PERSONS WHO ARE HOMELESS OR LIVING IN VULNERABLE HOUSING OR WHO HAVE RECENTLY EXPERIENCED HOMELESSNESS IN LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING A SAFE CREATIVE SPACE FOR THEM TO MEET REGULARLY BY OFFERING OPPORTUNITIES TO LISTEN TO AND TAKE PART IN MUSICAL AND ARTISTIC PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCES, AS A MEANS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE VULNERABLE HOUSING MEANS PERSONS WHO ARE SOFA SURFING DEFINED AS: SHARING A ROOF WITH SOMEONE WHERE THERE IS NO TENANCY RIGHTS; LIVING IN A HOSTEL OR SQUATTING IN A PROPERTY WHERE THERE IS NO TENANCY AT ALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rowleys Partnership Ltd
Unit 12
Harcourt Way
Meridian Business Park
LEICESTER
LE19 1WP
- Phone:
- 07780607063
- Email:
- soundcafeleics@gmail.com
- Website:
-
soundcafe.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window