EX-SERVICES HOME MESS (SHEFFIELD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an informal meeting place for service leavers and families to access help available. We offer visits to clients at home, or our own Mess room, carried out by the charity's staff, for all ex-servicemen or women. We will also mentor clients to find solutions to problems that may arise. We also run a free gardening service for aged or disabled Veterans who can't look after their own.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 27 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Halton | Chair | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ellwood | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Chapman | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Simmons | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Davey | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.84k | £2.25k | £2.29k | £5.42k | £6.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | £1.46k | £2.35k | £2.42k | £5.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN NEED OF FORMER MEMBERS OF ALL BRANCHES OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES RETURNING TO SHEFFIELD WITH A VIEW TO ENABLING EFFECTIVE RESETTLEMENT INTO CIVILIAN SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PROVIDING A POINT OF CONTACT FOR ALL EX-SERVICE PERSONNEL AND THEIR FAMILIES; AND 2) ACTING AS ADVOCATE AND INTERMEDIARY BETWEEN EX-SERVICE PERSONNEL AND LOCAL SUPPORT PROVIDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Welwyn Road
SHEFFIELD
S12 2JF
- Phone:
- 07901 551583
- Email:
- renshalt@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window