FRIENDS OF NAMUNCHA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the advancement of education of children and young people living in the Namuncha community in Kenya by supporting the establishment, maintenance, development and running of Namuncha Primary and Secondary schools and its staff and pupils and supporting pupils with bursaries and sponsorships to fulfill a secondary and post-secondary education, and support relevant research.'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
Governance
- 09 June 2015: Standard registration
- NAMUNCHA COMMUNITY SCHOOLS PROJECT (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR Arthur Hibble | Chair | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Paul Charles Rudman | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frank Huffer | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Feist | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANTHONY STRINGER | Trustee | 04 May 2015 |
|
|||||
CHARLOTTE TULINIUS | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.41k | £12.05k | £9.29k | £8.18k | £6.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.51k | £2.49k | £11.99k | £7.94k | £5.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 August 2022 | 523 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/06/2015 as amended on 22 Oct 2019 as amended on 09 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE NAMUNCHA COMMUNITY IN KENYA BY SUPPORTING THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE, DEVELOPMENT AND RUNNING OF NAMUNCHA PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS AND ITS STAFF AND PUPILS AND SUPPORTING PUPILS WITH BURSARIES AND SPONSORSHIPS TO FULFIL A SECONDARY SCHOOL EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SEARLE STREET
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 3DB
- Phone:
- 01223367239
- Email:
- ncspuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window