Financial history PERTHCELYN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 505941
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £7.28k £0 £4.04k £5.56k £310
Total expenditure £9.09k £0 £5.85k £3.17k £1.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A