Accounts and annual returns Fountain of Fire Prayer Restoration Ministry

Charity number: 1163267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 25 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 25 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 18 June 2024 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 18 June 2024 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 August 2022 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 23 August 2022 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 03 August 2021 64 days late Download Open in new window