THE MCNALLY BROWNSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants for the relief of suffering from cancer and the promotion of animal welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 02 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR MOORE | Chair | 24 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Simpson | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Simpson | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MIDDLETON | Trustee | 24 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.16k | £13.25k | £68.21k | £22.00k | £33.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.05k | £22.53k | £46.67k | £45.19k | £47.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 FEB 2015 as amended on 06 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (1) MEDICAL RESEARCH AND RELIEF OF SUFFERING: (A) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN ENGLAND. (B) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION. (C) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF MESOTHELIOMA AND CANCER THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. (D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MESOTHELIOMA AND CANCER. (2) ANIMAL WELFARE: (A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. (B) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NELSONS SOLICITORS
PENNINE HOUSE
8 STANFORD STREET
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 7BQ
- Phone:
- 01159895251
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window