AGAPE INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an evangelical church based in Bradford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 March 2024
Total income includes £31,269 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 27 November 2015: Standard registration
- AICC (Working name)
- AGAPE INERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KOLADE OBAFEMI OMOJOLA | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
RAPHAEL ABIODUN OWONONI | Trustee | 23 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
FIDELIS ALEGHE | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ALEGHE | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/03/2020 | 15/03/2021 | 15/03/2022 | 15/03/2023 | 15/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.91k | £41.44k | £55.22k | £98.14k | £143.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.66k | £40.81k | £55.72k | £97.50k | £138.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £11.40k | £19.75k | £31.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH OUR STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE BELOW IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. OUR DOCTRINAL BELIEFS ARE: I. WE BELIEVE THE BIBLE IS THE INSPIRED, ONLY INFALLIBLE AND AUTHORITATIVE WORD OF GOD. II. WE BELIEVE THERE IS ONE GOD AND ETERNALLY COEXISTENT IN THREE PERSONS: FATHER, SON AND HOLY SPIRIT. GOD THE FATHER IS THE CREATOR OF HEAVEN AND EARTH AND THE SUSTAINER OF ALL THINGS. THERE IS BUT ONE GOD, INFINITE, ETERNAL AND PERFECT IN HOLINESS, TRUTH AND LOVE. III. WE BELIEVE THE DEITY OF JESUS CHRIST, HIS VIRGIN BIRTH, HIS SINLESS LIFE, HIS MIRACLES, HIS VICARIOUS AND ATONING DEATH THROUGH HIS SHED BLOOD, HIS BURIAL, HIS BODILY RESURRECTION, AND HIS ASCENSION TO THE RIGHT HAND OF THE FATHER, AND HIS PERSONAL RETURN IN POWER AND GLORY. HE IS THE HEAD OF HIS BODY, THE CHURCH. IV. WE BELIEVE THAT MAN IS TOTALLY INCAPABLE OF RETURNING TO GOD IN HIMSELF AND IS LOST WITHOUT HOPE, APART FROM THE SALVATION OF JESUS CHRIST. V. WE BELIEVE THE PRESENT MINISTRY OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, BY WHOSE INDWELLING THE CHRISTIAN IS ENABLED TO LIVE A GODLY LIFE. VI. WE BELIEVE THE BAPTISM OF THE HOLY SPIRIT, WITH THE EVIDENCE OF SPEAKING IN TONGUES, IS AVAILABLE TO ALL THAT BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST, AND WILL TOTALLY SURRENDER THEIR LIVES TO THE COMPLETE, PERFECT WILL OF GOD. VII. WE BELIEVE THE GIFTS OF THE HOLY SPIRIT (THE WORD OF WISDOM, THE WORD OF KNOWLEDGE, FAITH, GIFTS OF HEALING, WORKING OF MIRACLES, PROPHECY, DISCERNING OF SPIRITS, DIVERSE KINDS OF TONGUES AND THE INTERPRETATION OF TONGUES) ARE AVAILABLE THROUGH THE HOLY SPIRIT, AND ARE FOR THE CHURCH TODAY. VIII.WE BELIEVE THE FRUIT OF THE HOLY SPIRIT (LOVE, JOY, PEACE, LONGSUFFERING, GENTLENESS, GOODNESS, FAITH, MEEKNESS AND TEMPERANCE-GAL 5:22 & 23) IX. WE BELIEVE IN THE CORPORATE WORSHIP OF BELIEVERS IN A LOCAL CHURCH AND IN WITNESSING TO OUR FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Agape Int'l Christian Centre
Mount Street
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD3 9SN
- Phone:
- 01274371725
- Email:
- aicccity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window