Accounts and annual returns ADLERIAN SOCIETY OF WALES

Charity number: 1164495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 06 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 26 February 2025 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 26 February 2025 271 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 July 2023 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 25 July 2023 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 November 2022 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 01 November 2022 154 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 September 2021 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 September 2021 120 days late Download Open in new window