ADLERIAN SOCIETY OF WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Well- Being Courses for the Community Counselling Training- Introduction Course to the Psychology of Alfred Adler Support and Counselling for Families, Children and Young People Counselling by Professional Counsellors working online and face to face
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 20 November 2015: CIO registration
- ASOW (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Vallance | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sue Gavin | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA KATHRYN MCKENZIE EDWARDS | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WORLEY RICHARDSON | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Howard | Trustee | 07 August 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.96k | £52.08k | £48.87k | £13.50k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.11k | £59.29k | £55.23k | £31.69k | £36.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 271 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 September 2021 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 September 2021 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WORK OF ALFRED ADLER AND IN THE SCHOOL OF PSYCHOLOGY HE FOUNDED. 2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN INDIVIDUAL PSYCHOLOGY, ADLERIAN COUNSELLING AND PARENTING BY PROVIDING TUITION AND TRAINING PROGRAMMES. 3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF PERSONS IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF PSYCHOTHERAPY AND COUNSELLING AND SOCIAL SUPPORT NETWORKS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE ELDERLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pantygorphwys Farm
Stoneyford
Narberth
SA67 7NX
- Phone:
- 07484860982
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window