THE QUEEN'S CLUB FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Queen's Club Foundation seeks to improve lives through racket sports (including lawn tennis, real tennis, squash, rackets and padel) to help to achieve an inclusive, healthy and engaged community in such charitable ways as the Charity Trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Smith | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Wardle | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Cockroft | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Vandamme | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Vasu Majumdar | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MORSE | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEANE CHRISTIAN BOWMAN PENNICK | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.12k | £48.54k | £129.77k | £56.00k | £191.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.05k | £62.13k | £73.86k | £54.00k | £114.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/10/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION, ESPECIALLY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR IN THE SPORTS OF LAWN TENNIS, REAL TENNIS, SQUASH AND RACKETS (THE SPORTS) AND TO ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE SKILLS OF THOSE PLAYING THE SPORTS IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, BY: 1) PROVIDING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES THAT PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORTS; AND 2) PROVIDING GRANTS AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE, TO ALLOW THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN ONE OR MORE OF THE SPORTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Queens Club Ltd
Palliser Road
LONDON
W14 9EQ
- Phone:
- 02073863444
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window