ASIALINK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AsiaLink is a Christian mission agency connecting churches with ministry among the unreached peoples of Asia. We help support evangelists and church-planters in some of the region's most inaccessible areas and respond with relief and community development projects. We minister in over 300 church meetings, mission conferences and Bible studies every year in the UK and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- Bhutan
- Burma
- China
- India
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Laos
- Maldives
- Mongolia
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- North Korea
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
- Vietnam
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 02 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 02 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE; AND 4.2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY WORLDWIDE BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS THAT ARE WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window