HEWAD WELFARE

Charity number: 1162514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We organise community based gatherings which include celebrating religious festivals like Eid and cultural gatherings like celebrating the Afghan New Year and other gatherings. These gatherings are means of promoting communal harmony and social tolerance. Sometimes we arrange for basic Pashto (Afghan) Language classes for the young and the teachers are arranged for on a temporary basis when needed

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £1,495
Total expenditure: £7,096

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Afghanistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 July 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HAZARBOOZ WELFARE LIMITED (Previous name)
  • HEWAD WELFARE LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abdul Ali Aziz Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
MOHAMMED AJMAL AZIZI Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
MAHAMED BASHIR Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £15.04k £14.83k £5.97k £5.53k £1.50k
Total expenditure £7.53k £30.47k £2.36k £6.14k £7.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 05 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Beech Tree Close
STANMORE
Middlesex
HA7 4UB
Phone:
07447455566
Website:

No information available