WECARE WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WECare Worldwide is a veterinary-run charity, currently operating in Sri Lanka and providing healthcare to the large number of stray dogs on the island. We focus heavily on neutering and vaccination programmes in the communities, as well as providing treatments to sick and injured animals at our clinic. In order to provide sustainable change, education programmes are also provided in schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 24 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Mansbridge | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Margaret Mockford | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louise Bailey | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Avril Donnan | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Carruthers | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.47k | £320.27k | £361.26k | £486.16k | £335.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.28k | £243.26k | £280.60k | £360.74k | £483.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY A) PROVIDING VETERINARY CARE TO ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION DUE TO SICKNESS, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, NEGLECT OR THREAT OF DISEASE. B) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT RESPONSIBLE ANIMAL OWNERSHIP, DISEASE AWARENESS AND PREVENTATIVE HEALTHCARE. C) PROVIDING A HUMANE METHOD OF FERAL ANIMAL CONTROL VIA NEUTERING PROGRAMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WECare Worldwide
Oak Lodge
Kirkbride
Wigton
Cumbria
CA7 5JH
- Phone:
- 0191 468 2950
- Email:
- info@wecareworldwide.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window