Accounts and annual returns THE CHARLES WILLIAM ERIC BACON PRIZES FOR CREATIVE WRITING

Charity number: 505956
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 11 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 11 May 2012 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 11 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 05 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required