MARKAZ AL-TAQWA COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Islamic religious education open to all public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 30 November 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Farhan Abdi Guled | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
OMAR ABDIRAHMAN | Trustee | 05 September 2014 |
|
|||||
YAKUB ABDI | Trustee | 05 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.08k | £37.92k | £56.54k | £78.76k | £89.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.59k | £40.75k | £41.29k | £61.99k | £74.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 March 2025 | 605 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2022
(These accounts |
26 March 2025 | 605 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 August 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2021
(These accounts |
19 August 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 September 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 16 September 2021 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 September 2020 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 September 2020 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND IMPROVE THE LIVES OF REFUGEES AND OTHER NEWLY ARRIVED IMMIGRANTS TO THE UNITED KINGDOM (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE PEOPLE OF EAST AFRICAN ORIGIN LIVING WITHIN GREATER MANCHESTER) AND TO ENSURE THAT THEIR INTEGRATION INTO THE MAINSTREAM SOCIETY IS AS SEAMLESS AS POSSIBLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A) ADVICE, INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO ACCESS APPROPRIATE TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES B) AFTER SCHOOL PROGRAMMES AND SPORTING EVENTS TO REDUCE YOUTH DELIQUENCY C) PROMOTION OF CIVIC AND CULTURAL EVENTS TO ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION IN THE DEMOCRATIC SYSTEM AND BECOME GOOD CITIZENS D) COUNSELLING AND CRIME PREVENTION EDUCATION THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG REFUGEES AND OTHER NEWLY ARRIVED IMMIGRANTS TO THE UNITED KINGDOM (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE PEOPLE OF EAST AFRICAN ORIGIN LIVING WITHIN GREATER MANCHESTER) THROUGH: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES B) ORGANISING EVENTS, SEMINARS, CONFERENCES AND WORKSHOPS ON HEALTH ISSUES [NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Contact information
- Address:
-
230 PLYMOUTH GROVE
MANCHESTER
M13 0AS
- Phone:
- 07984741450
- Email:
- yakub-92@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window