Governing document GUJARAT HINDU SOCIETY, PRESTON
Charity Number: 505959

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 1984, 14 JANUARY 1990, 23 SEPTEMBER 2001, 8 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 8TH SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HINDU RELIGION OF THE GUJARAT HINDU COMMUNITY IN PRESTON AND DISTRICT. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE RULES AND CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PRESTON AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.